Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Teacher Salary Enhancement Grant - Established
Sponsored by
Delegates Wilson, C. Howard, Impallaria, McComas, and Patterson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Teacher Salary Enhancement Grant to fund a certain increase in teacher salaries to county boards of education that provide a certain amount of matching funds; requiring the Governor annually to include a certain amount in the State operating budget for the Grant beginning in fiscal year 2020; requiring the State to distribute a certain Grant at the same time as other funds are distributed; requiring the Grant and certain county board funds to be in addition to certain other funds; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Teacher Salary Enhancement Grant - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Text - First - Education - Teacher Salary Enhancement Grant - Established
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-219 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM