Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation – Student Education Loans – Ombudsman
Sponsored by
Delegates Frick, A. Miller, Barkley, Barve, Brooks, Chang, Fennell, Frush, Gutierrez, Hayes, Healey, Hettleman, C. Howard, Jalisi, Korman, Krimm, Lam, J. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, McComas, McIntosh, Moon, Rosenberg, Stein, Tarlau, Turner, Valentino-Smith, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Rosapepe)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Commissioner of Financial Regulation to designate an individual as the Student Loan Ombudsman to serve as a liaison between student loan borrowers and student loan servicers; establishing the duties and responsibilities of the Student Loan Ombudsman; requiring the Ombudsman, in consultation with the Commissioner, to establish a certain student loan borrower education course with certain requirements; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1012
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {703794/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {257371/1
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Student Education Loans - Ombudsman and Licensing of Servicers
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments {703794/1 Adopted 46
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Commissioner of Financial Regulation – Student Education Loans – Ombudsman
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 47
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48A
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable with Amendments {257371/1 62A
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted 62A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM