Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Perpetual Conservation Easements
Sponsored by
Delegates Jackson, Proctor, and Vallario
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Synopsis
Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for the first $500,000 in proceeds from the sale of a perpetual conservation easement on real property in the State; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2015.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0371
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Jackson) Adopted (134-2)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
45
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Jackson) Adopted (134-2) 45
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations 45
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM