Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Teachers and Teacher Preparation Programs - Maryland Reading Standards Matrix - Established
Sponsored by
Delegate A. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education, the University System of Maryland, and the Maryland Higher Education Commission to develop a Maryland Reading Standards Matrix on or before March 1, 2019; requiring the matrix to reflect certain standards and research; requiring the Department, the System, and the Commission to develop a certain syllabus and timeline for certain faculty and to establish a certain accreditation process for certain programs; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Teachers and Teacher Preparation Programs - Maryland Reading Standards Matrix - Established
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM