Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Small Business Personal Property Tax Relief Act of 2018
Sponsored by
Delegates Malone, Arentz, Carozza, Ciliberti, Clark, Flanagan, Hornberger, Kipke, Kittleman, McComas, Metzgar, W. Miller, Morgan, Saab, Shoemaker, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting from the personal property tax persons with certain personal property that has a total assessed value of $10,000 or less for the taxable year beginning after December 31, 2018, and each taxable year thereafter; requiring a person annually to apply for a certain exemption to the State Department of Assessments and Taxation by a certain time; requiring the Department to establish application procedures for the personal property tax exemption under the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Small Business Personal Property Tax Relief Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Small Business Personal Property Tax Relief Act of 2018
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-101, 7-245 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM