Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Police Vehicles - Use of Cruise or Directional Marker Lights
Sponsored by
Delegate Mosby (By Request - Baltimore City Police Department)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that certain police vehicles may be equipped with and display cruise or directional marker lights; and authorizing the driver of a police vehicle to use cruise or directional marker lights at any time.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {120811/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Police Vehicles - Use of Cruise or Directional Marker Lights
House 3/02/2018 3/05/2018 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {120811/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Police Vehicles - Use of Cruise or Directional Marker Lights
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 48
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48B
Senate 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-218 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM