Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Hearing Board
Sponsored by
Delegate Anderson (By Request - Baltimore City Administration)
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a law enforcement officer who receives probation before judgment for certain charges is not entitled to a hearing under the Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights; providing for the selection and composition of a hearing board in Baltimore City; excluding Baltimore City from a certain provision allowing for an alternative method for forming a hearing board under the Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights when the alternative method has been agreed to under certain collective bargaining agreements; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1179
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1023 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Baltimore City - Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Hearing Board
House 4/04/2018 4/05/2018 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-107, 3-108 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM