Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Aids for the Cessation of Tobacco Product Use - Prescribing and Dispensing by Pharmacists and Health Insurance Coverage
Sponsored by
Delegate Hayes
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing a pharmacist who meets the requirements of certain regulations to prescribe and dispense medications approved by the U.S. Food and Drug Administration as an aid for the cessation of the use of tobacco products; requiring the State Board of Pharmacy, by September 1, 2019, to adopt certain regulations; altering the definition of "nicotine replacement therapy" to require certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations to provide coverage for certain over-the-counter products; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018, January 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Aids for the Cessation of Tobacco Product Use - Prescribing and Dispensing by Pharmacists and Health Insurance Coverage
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-101, 12-512 )
(   15-841 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM