Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Personal Motor Vehicle Rentals
Sponsored by
Delegates Flanagan, McCray, Beidle, and Davis
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing provisions of law governing the rental of personal motor vehicles to other persons in a certain manner; establishing that certain persons may rent only certain classes of personal motor vehicles to other persons; prohibiting a renter of a personal motor vehicle from using the motor vehicle for certain purposes; prohibiting a certain person from renting a personal motor vehicle to another person unless certain requirements are met; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Personal Motor Vehicle Rentals
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Personal Motor Vehicle Rentals
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-301 )
(   18-101.1, 18-201 through 18-205, 23-107 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM