Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Life Insurance - Sale by Telephone
Sponsored by
Delegate Cullison
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that an insurance producer that sells a policy of life insurance solely by telephone is deemed to be in compliance with a certain requirement if the life insurer issuing the policy sends a notice via first-class mail within 7 days of the sale and notifies the insured that the insured may surrender the policy within 30 days, the face amount of the policy does not exceed $100,000, a certain license number was disclosed during the call, and the life insurer maintains a certain recording for a certain period of time; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Life Insurance - Sale by Telephone
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Life Insurance - Sale by Telephone
House 3/09/2018 3/12/2018 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-119 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM