Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government – Appointments Office in the Office of the Governor – Reporting
Sponsored by
Delegates Lam, Jones, and McIntosh
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Appointments Office in the Office of the Governor to submit a certain report by December 31, 2018, regarding certain activities of the Office to the Joint Committee on Fair Practices and State Personnel Oversight of the General Assembly; and providing for the termination of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Ethics Law - Official Duties - Violations of Law
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {314665/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/9 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (50-87)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (88-48)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
64
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Public Ethics Law - Official Duties - Violations of Law
House 3/02/2018 3/05/2018 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments {314665/1 Adopted 62
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Motion Special Order until 4/9 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (50-87) 62
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 62
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Text - Third - State Government – Appointments Office in the Office of the Governor – Reporting
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (88-48) 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Referred Rules 64
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM