Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
County Boards of Education - Home Instruction Program - Observation of Instruction and Reporting of Abuse and Neglect
Sponsored by
Delegates Turner, Kaiser, and Ebersole
Status
In the House - Rereferred to Ways and Means
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the parent or guardian of a certain student to submit certain information to the county board of education before the student begins a home instruction program; requiring the parent or guardian of a student in a home instruction program to allow a representative of the county board to observe instruction of the home instruction program; requiring a representative of a county board to notify certain agencies if the representative has reason to believe a child has been subjected to abuse or neglect; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - County Boards of Education - Home Instruction Program - Observation of Instruction and Reporting of Abuse and Neglect
House 3/09/2018 3/12/2018 Rereferred to Ways and Means
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-134 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM