Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Independent Institutions of Higher Education - Police Force
Sponsored by
Delegate Glenn
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing an independent institution of higher education in Baltimore City to establish a campus police force based on a certain memorandum of understanding; authorizing a police officer of a campus police force of an independent institution of higher education in Baltimore City to exercise the powers granted to a peace and police officer only on certain property with certain exceptions; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1241
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Baltimore City - Independent Institutions of Higher Education - Police Force
House 3/09/2018 3/12/2018 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-211.1 )
(   3-101, 3-201 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM