Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Marriage License Fees - Distribution of Proceeds PG 433-18
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Director of Finance of Prince George's County to distribute the proceeds from the additional marriage license fee to battered spouse shelters and domestic violence programs in accordance with the criteria and procedures established by the Prince George's County Department of Social Services.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Walker) Adopted (119-4)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Walker) Adopted (119-4) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - First - Prince George's County - Marriage License Fees - Distribution of Proceeds PG 433-18
House 3/30/2018 4/02/2018 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   2-401, 2-404 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page