Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Increasing Maryland's Competitiveness Through Gender Diversity in Boardrooms
Sponsored by
Delegates McIntosh, Barron, Barve, Flanagan, Frush, Gibson, Gutierrez, Healey, Jalisi, Jones, Kaiser, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, Lierman, Luedtke, McCray, A. Miller, Proctor, Sample-Hughes, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Waldstreicher, M. Washington, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Recognizing certain evidence showing a deficiency in the gender diversity of Maryland boardrooms and the comparative high performance of companies where women are more strongly represented in top management; encouraging equitable and diverse gender representation on the boards and in senior management of companies and organizations in the State of Maryland; and urging certain institutions and companies to have a minimum of 30% of women directors by December 31, 2021; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SJ0004
Bill File Type: Regular
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Increasing Maryland's Competitiveness Through Gender Diversity in Boardrooms
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/19 at 3:00 p.m.
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Hearing 2/26 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM