Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Assembly Compensation Commission - Legislative Pension Plan - Closure to Current and Future Members
Sponsored by
Delegate Krebs
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the Resolution of the General Assembly Compensation Commission dated January 16, 2018, and transmitted to the General Assembly on January 23, 2018, be amended to close the Legislative Pension Plan to new membership on or after January 9, 2019, and be amended to provide that no new service credit may be earned in the Legislative Pension Plan on or after January 9, 2019; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SJ0009
Bill File Type: Regular
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - General Assembly Compensation Commission - Legislative Pension Plan - Closure to Current and Future Members
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/26 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM