Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsored by
Delegates Gaines, Ali, Anderson, Angel, Atterbeary, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Beidle, Brooks, Chang, Cullison, Davis, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Gibson, Gilchrist, Glenn, Gutierrez, Hayes, Haynes, Hill, Hixson, Holmes, C. Howard, Jackson, Jameson, Jones, Kelly, Kramer, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Luedtke, McCray, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Mosby, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Proctor, Queen, Reznik, Robinson, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Sophocleus, Stein, Sydnor, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilkins, Wilson, K. Young, P. Young, Barve, Bromwell, Carr, Clippinger, Healey, McIntosh, and Pendergrass
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Applying to the U.S. Congress for an amendments convention called under Article V of the U.S. Constitution, on the application of the legislatures of two-thirds of the several states, to propose an amendment to the U.S. Constitution that authorizes regulation of contributions and expenditures intended to influence elections.
Details
Cross-filed with: SJ0007
Bill File Type: Regular
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {993427/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-42)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment
House 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Hearing 3/05 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable with Amendments {993427/1 Adopted 44
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (94-42) 46
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM