Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - In Vitro Fertilization - Use of Spouse's Sperm - Exception
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 325
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations must provide benefits for expenses arising from in vitro fertilization procedures; providing an exception to the required use of a spouse's sperm to fertilize the oocytes of a patient whose spouse is of the opposite sex; and providing the Act shall apply to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, renewed, or in force in the State on or after July 1, 2016.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0011
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
5/28/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {867479/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
12
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
12
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-10)
Proceedings
14
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
15
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {636586/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (110-24)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-10)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 325
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 5/28/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/26/2016 1/27/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments {867479/1 Report Adopted 12
Senate 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 12
Senate 2/01/2016 2/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (36-10) 14
House 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations 15
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments {636586/1 Report Adopted 56
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (110-24) 57
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendment 56
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Third Reading Passed (36-10) 56
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Passed Enrolled 56
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 325
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-810 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM