Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Howard County - Sheriff - Salary Increase
Sponsored by
Senator Robey
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Increasing the annual salary of the Sheriff of Howard County to $95,000 over a 4-year period; and providing that the Act does not apply to the salary or compensation of the incumbent Sheriff during a specified term of office.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1406
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
11/14/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/02/2013
Legislative Date
1/02/2013
Action
Hearing 1/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2013
Legislative Date
1/07/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/05/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2012 11/14/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/02/2013 1/02/2013 Hearing 1/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/07/2013 1/07/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/01/2013 2/05/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM