Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel - Applicants for Employment - Criminal History Records Checks
Sponsored by
Senator Pugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting specified appointing authorities in the Judicial, Executive, and Legislative branches of State government from inquiring into the criminal record or criminal history of an applicant for employment until the applicant has been provided an opportunity for an interview; providing that the Act does not prohibit specified appointing authorities from notifying an applicant for employment of specified information; providing for exceptions; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0671 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
10/25/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2013
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2013
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2013
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/21/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/22/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
9
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/22/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
9
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-9)
Proceedings
11
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
13
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {114767/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (102-34)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (39-4)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2012 10/25/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/08/2013 1/08/2013 Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/09/2013 1/09/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/09/2013 1/09/2013 Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/18/2013 1/21/2013 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/22/2013 1/22/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 9
Senate 1/22/2013 1/22/2013 Second Reading Passed 9
Senate 1/24/2013 1/24/2013 Third Reading Passed (33-9) 11
House 1/25/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Appropriations 13
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments {114767/1 Report Adopted 61
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (102-34) 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendments 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (39-4) 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM