Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Repeal
Sponsored by
Senator Kittleman
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that, on or before July 1, 2013, a county or municipality subject to a specified municipal stormwater permit adopt and implement laws or ordinances to establish a watershed protection and restoration program; repealing the requirement that a county or municipality maintain or administer a local watershed protection and restoration fund; repealing the requirement that a county or municipality establish and annually collect a stormwater remediation fee; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0097
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
9/04/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2014
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/21/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/21/2014
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:45 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 9/04/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/08/2014 1/08/2014 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 1/21/2014 1/21/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/21/2014 1/21/2014 Hearing 1/28 at 1:45 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 2/19/2014 2/20/2014 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-201.1, 4-202.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM