Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Impersonating a Military Member - Penalties (Stolen Valor Act of 2016)
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from misrepresenting oneself as a member or veteran of the United States armed forces or an organized militia or falsely holding oneself out to be a recipient of a specified military decoration or medal; and establishing penalties for violation of the Act of imprisonment not to exceed 1 year or a fine of not more than $2,500 or both.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0068
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
6/04/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 6/04/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-906 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM