Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prevailing Wage Law - Applicability - Elementary and Secondary School Construction
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the definitions of "public body" and "public work" for the purpose of applying the prevailing wage law to all elementary and secondary school construction, rather than only to elementary and secondary school construction that meets specified requirements; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
6/17/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 6/17/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM