Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources – Regulation and Use of Commercial Finfish Gear
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Natural Resources)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the termination provision for certain provisions of law governing the regulation and use of commercial finfish trotlines; repealing a provision of law prohibiting the installation and use of monofilament gill nets in the Chesapeake Bay; authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to adopt regulations authorizing the use of monofilament gill nets; establishing a commercial license authorizing the holder to catch for sale blue and flathead catfish in the tidal waters of the State using a finfish trotline; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/22/2018
Legislative Date
10/22/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {294130/1 Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {260010/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Natural Resources – Regulation and Use of Commercial Finfish Gear
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources – Regulation and Use of Commercial Finfish Gear
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/22/2018 10/22/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Natural Resources - Regulation and Use of Commercial Finfish Trotlines - Repeal of Sunset
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 Hearing 1/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {294130/1 Adopted 24
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24
Text - Third - Natural Resources – Regulation and Use of Commercial Finfish Trotlines – Repeal of Sunset and License Establishment
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 26
House 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation 28
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable with Amendments {260010/1 Adopted 56
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 57
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 60
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 60
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Natural Resources – Regulation and Use of Commercial Finfish Gear
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources – Regulation and Use of Commercial Finfish Gear
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-221, 4-701, 4-701.2, 4-710 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM