Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Maryland Green Building Council - Membership
Sponsored by
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee (By Request - Departmental - General Services)
Status
In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the Maryland Green Building Council by removing the Secretary of Housing and Community Development, or the Secretary's designee, as a member and substituting the Secretary of Labor, or the Secretary's designee, as a member.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/28/2019
Legislative Date
8/28/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/19/2019
Legislative Date
12/19/2019
Action
Hearing 1/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Green Building Council - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
3
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
3
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Green Building Council - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
5
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
6
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/28/2019 8/28/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 12/19/2019 12/19/2019 Hearing 1/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Green Building Council - Membership
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 Favorable Adopted 3
Senate 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 Second Reading Passed 3
Text - Third - Maryland Green Building Council - Membership
Senate 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 5
House 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Referred Environment and Transportation 6
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:40 AM