Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Regulation of Milk Products - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senator Getty
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering specified definitions related to the regulation of milk products; repealing the limitation on the number of milk processor - farmstead cheese producer permits the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene may issue; repealing the requirement that an applicant for a milk processor - farmstead cheese producer permit operate a dairy farm with no more than 120 cows or goats in the herd; repealing the limit on the number of times a milk processor - farmstead cheese producer permit may be renewed; making the Act an emergency measure; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
8/25/2014
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
1/14/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/05/2015 8/25/2014 Pre-filed
Senate 1/05/2015 1/14/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/19/2015 2/23/2015 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-401, 21-416.1, 21-417 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM