Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Risk Management and Own Risk and Solvency Assessment Act
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 36
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified carriers to maintain a risk management framework for specified purposes; requiring specified carriers or specified insurance groups to conduct an own risk and solvency assessment regularly or at any time when there are significant changes to the carrier's or insurance group's risk profile; requiring specified carriers to submit to the Maryland Insurance Commissioner a specified report or reports on request or if the Commissioner is the lead state commissioner of a specified insurance group; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/22/2016
Legislative Date
9/22/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Insurance - Risk Management and Own Risk and Solvency Assessment Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2017
Legislative Date
1/10/2017
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {277270/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Insurance - Risk Management and Own Risk and Solvency Assessment Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {763791/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 36
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Insurance - Risk Management and Own Risk and Solvency Assessment Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/22/2016 9/22/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Insurance - Risk Management and Own Risk and Solvency Assessment Act
Senate 1/10/2017 1/10/2017 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Favorable with Amendments {277270/1 Adopted 28
Senate 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28
Text - Third - Insurance - Risk Management and Own Risk and Solvency Assessment Act
Senate 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 30
House 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Referred Economic Matters 33
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing canceled
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/29/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Favorable with Amendments {763791/1 Adopted 59
House 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 60
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 56
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 56
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Insurance - Risk Management and Own Risk and Solvency Assessment Act
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 36
Text - Chapter - Insurance - Risk Management and Own Risk and Solvency Assessment Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   32-101 through 32-110 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM