Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Custody and Visitation - Deployed Parents
Sponsored by
Senator Cassilly
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a court in any child custody or visitation proceeding from considering, in and of itself, a parent's past deployment or possible future deployment in determining the best interest of a child except under specified circumstances; authorizing a party or witness who is subject to deployment to provide testimony and present evidence by electronic means or by telephone under specified circumstances; authorizing the court to grant caretaking or decision-making authority to a nonparent under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0636
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0813 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
7/05/2016
Legislative Date
7/05/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Child Custody and Visitation - Deployed Parents
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2017
Legislative Date
1/04/2017
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 7/05/2016 7/05/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Child Custody and Visitation - Deployed Parents
Senate 1/04/2017 1/04/2017 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-108 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM