Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Contraband - Telecommunication Devices - Penalty
Sponsored by
Senator Shank
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from attempting to deliver a telecommunication device to a person detained or confined in a specified place of confinement; increasing the penalty for a second or subsequent violation; and requiring a specified sentence to be served consecutive to another sentence.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0478 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
9/05/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 9/05/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/21/2014 2/24/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-417 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM