Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Capital Projects - Inclusion of Public Art
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Commerce)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 83
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring, to the extent practicable and subject to certain waiver provisions, that the State include public art in capital projects that are funded entirely with state funds, or are funded with a combination of at least 50% of State funds and the remainder from funds from private entities, and are not funded in the annual State capital budget; providing it is the intent of the General Assembly that the requirements of the Act will not increase the cost of a construction project or a major renovation project; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/16/2018
Legislative Date
10/16/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Capital Projects - Inclusion of Public Art
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {747373/1 Adopted
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Capital Projects - Inclusion of Public Art
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {114069/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-6)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Capital Projects - Inclusion of Public Art
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 83
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Capital Projects - Inclusion of Public Art
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/16/2018 10/16/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Capital Projects - Inclusion of Public Art
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments {747373/1 Adopted 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Capital Projects - Inclusion of Public Art
Senate 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 21 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Referred Appropriations 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable with Amendments {114069/1 Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (132-6) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Capital Projects - Inclusion of Public Art
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 83
Text - Chapter - Capital Projects - Inclusion of Public Art
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page