Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - State Militia
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Military)
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying that service in the Maryland Defense Force is voluntary and a member may be dismissed with cause at any time; altering the classes of State militia; repealing the requirement that a specified individual take a specified oath; repealing specified authorization and requirements relating to organizational commanders; prohibiting the Maryland Defense Force or its members from accepting gifts, donations, gratuities, or anything of value in exchange for a service rendered; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/30/2016
Legislative Date
9/30/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - State Militia
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2017
Legislative Date
1/06/2017
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Miller) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Waugh) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {903829/1 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety - State Militia
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-2)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/30/2016 9/30/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Public Safety - State Militia
Senate 1/06/2017 1/06/2017 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable 43
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Miller) Adopted 43
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable 43
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Waugh) Adopted 43
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable Adopted 44
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Floor Amendment {903829/1 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 44
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Public Safety - State Militia
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-2) 45
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Referred Health and Government Operations 48
House 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-101, 13-203, 13-204, 13-206, 13-207, 13-210 through 13-213, 13-401, 13-407, 13-408, 13-501 through 13-504, 13-506, 13-509, 13-510, 13-601 through 13-603, 13-706, 13-902 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM