Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Facilities - Nursing Homes - Limit on Residents per Multiple Occupancy Bedroom
Sponsored by
Senator Muse
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a nursing home constructed after October 1, 2018, from allowing more than two residents to occupy a multiple occupancy bedroom.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/04/2017
Legislative Date
8/04/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/04/2017 8/04/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health Care Facilities - Nursing Homes - Limit on Residents per Multiple Occupancy Bedroom
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page