Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Inspections (Jonathan's Law)
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Failed (21-25)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a political subdivision to require inspections of multifamily dwellings with balconies at least every 10 years, beginning no later than 10 years after the balcony is constructed, to ensure that each balcony meets specified requirements; authorizing a political subdivision to conduct inspections, to authorize a third party to conduct inspections, or to require a specified professional inspector to conduct and certify the inspections in a specified manner; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0469
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0196 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
10/23/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {764038/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/5 (Senator Mathias) Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/6 (Senator Forehand) Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Young) Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Young) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Young) Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Young) {473424/1
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/12 (Senator Young) Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Young) {473424/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Young) {943821/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Third Reading Failed (21-25)
Proceedings
45
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2012 10/23/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/22/2013 2/25/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Favorable with Amendments {764038/1 Report Adopted 33
Senate 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33
Senate 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 Special Order until 3/5 (Senator Mathias) Adopted 35
Senate 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Special Order until 3/6 (Senator Forehand) Adopted 38
Senate 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Young) Adopted 39
Senate 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Young) Adopted 40
Senate 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Young) Adopted 41
Senate 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Young) {473424/1 41
Senate 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Special Order until 3/12 (Senator Young) Adopted 41
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Young) {473424/1 Adopted 43
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Young) {943821/1 Adopted 43
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Senate 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Third Reading Failed (21-25) 45
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM