Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Energy for Homeowners Association
Sponsored by
Senator Mathias
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting from the sales and use tax sales of electricity, steam, or artificial or natural gas to a homeowners association for use in property owned or maintained by the homeowners association; and requiring the Comptroller, on or before October 1, 2016, to provide specified notice of the exemption authorized by the Act on the Comptroller's Web site.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0405
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1291 Session: 2011 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
9/18/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 9/18/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM