Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bed and Breakfast License
Sponsored by
Wicomico County Senators
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 589
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Class B-BB (bed and breakfast) beer and wine license in Wicomico County; providing the qualifications that must be met for issuance of the license; authorizing the license holder to sell alcoholic beverages to guests of the establishment for on-premises consumption Monday through Sunday, from 7 a.m. to midnight; authorizing the license holder to sell alcoholic beverages to guests of certain catered events under certain circumstances; setting an annual license fee of $300; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0197
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/20/2018
Legislative Date
11/20/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bed and Breakfast License
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {204637/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bed and Breakfast License
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 589
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bed and Breakfast License
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/20/2018 11/20/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bed and Breakfast License
Senate 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable with Amendments {204637/1 Adopted 40
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bed and Breakfast License
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 42
House 3/11/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Economic Matters 43A
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 65
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 589
Text - Chapter - Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bed and Breakfast License
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   32-1001, 32-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM