Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day
Sponsored by
Senators Patterson and Carozza
Status
In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim the fourth Thursday in March as Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day; and requiring the proclamation to urge educational and cultural organizations to observe Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day through appropriate and informative programs and activities.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0716
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/19/2019
Legislative Date
9/19/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {153223/1 (Senator Carozza) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/19/2019 9/19/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Favorable Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Floor Amendment {153223/1 (Senator Carozza) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 46 Click to view Recorded Media
(   7-402, 7-402 through 7-417 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:46 PM
Click to return on the top page