Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - State Occupational Mechanical Licensing Boards' Fund - Elevator Safety Review Board
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Failed (22-25)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding the Elevator Safety Review Board to the list of occupational boards that contribute to the State Occupational Mechanical Licensing Boards' Fund; repealing the requirement that certain fees be paid into the Elevator Safety Review Board Fund; authorizing the Board to set by regulation reasonable fees based on certain calculations; requiring the Board to publish a schedule of fees and to pay certain fees to the Comptroller; requiring the Comptroller to distribute the fees to the State Occupational Mechanical Licensing Board's Fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/25/2018
Legislative Date
10/25/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Failed (22-25)
Proceedings
17
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/25/2018 10/25/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - State Occupational Mechanical Licensing Boards' Fund - Elevator Safety Review Board
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 Hearing 1/24 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Favorable Adopted 15
Senate 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Second Reading Passed 15
Text - Third - Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - State Occupational Mechanical Licensing Boards' Fund - Elevator Safety Review Board
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Third Reading Failed (22-25) 17
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-106.10, 2-106.9 )
(   12-824, 12-824.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM