Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Home Wheelchair Lifts and Stairlifts
Sponsored by
Senator Brinkley
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting from the sales and use tax the sale of home wheelchair lifts and stairlifts; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0404 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
11/15/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2013
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
22
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2012 11/15/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/09/2013 1/09/2013 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Senate 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 20
Senate 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Second Reading Passed 20
Senate 2/11/2013 2/11/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 22
House 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 First Reading Ways and Means 25
House 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-211 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM