Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Services - Interagency Council on Homelessness - Membership
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 331
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the composition of the Interagency Council on Homelessness; increasing, from six to nine, the number of representatives from diverse geographical regions of the State engaged in homeless advocacy; requiring the Governor to designate as chair of the Council a member who is a secretary or a secretary's designee with decision making authority on issues that relate to the work of the Council; stating the intent of the General Assembly regarding the decision making authority of a specified designee on the Council; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0593
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
11/05/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {487676/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
19
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {674368/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 331
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 11/05/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Favorable with Amendments {487676/1 Report Adopted 18
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 18
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 19
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Appropriations 21
House 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments {674368/1 Report Adopted 61
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0) 62
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 61
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Passed Enrolled 61
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 331
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-418, 6-419, 6-420 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM