Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland False Claims Act - Municipal Corporations
Sponsored by
Senators Kagan, Young, King, and Peters
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 632
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "governmental entity" to include a municipal corporation for purposes of the Maryland False Claims Act; requiring the attorney for each municipal corporation to report annually, beginning October 1, 2016, to the General Assembly on the number of specified civil actions and the number of specified claims made by a governmental entity that are settled without filing a civil action; and providing for the prospective application of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
7/18/2016
Legislative Date
7/18/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland False Claims Act - Municipal Corporations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2017
Legislative Date
1/04/2017
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {168375/1 Adopted
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland False Claims Act - Municipal Corporations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (107-30)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 632
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland False Claims Act - Municipal Corporations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 7/18/2016 7/18/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Maryland False Claims Act - Municipal Corporations
Senate 1/04/2017 1/04/2017 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {168375/1 Adopted 23
Senate 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23
Text - Third - Maryland False Claims Act - Municipal Corporations
Senate 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 25
House 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Referred Judiciary 28
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (107-30) 62
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 632
Text - Chapter - Maryland False Claims Act - Municipal Corporations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-101, 8-110 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM