Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Agency Loan Program and Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan Program - Merger
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Energy Administration)
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Merging the Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan Program and the State Agency Loan Program; altering the definition of "borrower" for the purpose of provisions of law governing the Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan Program to include an eligible State agency; altering the purpose of the Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan Program to include providing certain financial assistance to State agencies for certain projects; exempting State agencies from certain Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan Program requirements; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/21/2017
Legislative Date
9/21/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2018
Legislative Date
1/03/2018
Action
Hearing 1/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2018
Legislative Date
1/15/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2018
Legislative Date
1/16/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
5
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
7
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
8
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Reassigned to Economic Matters
Proceedings
13
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/21/2017 9/21/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - State Agency Loan Program and Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan Program - Merger
Senate 1/03/2018 1/03/2018 Hearing 1/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 1/15/2018 1/15/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/16/2018 1/16/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 5
Text - Third - State Agency Loan Program and Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan Program - Merger
Senate 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 7
House 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 8
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Reassigned to Economic Matters 13
House 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-20A-01, 9-20A-03, 9-20A-05, 9-20A-06 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM