Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County Public Schools - Revocation of Magnet Status - Approval
Sponsored by
Senators Brochin and Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that, in Baltimore County, the revocation of the magnet status of a public school approved by the Baltimore County Board of Education after recommendation by the county superintendent does not become effective until the revocation is approved by the majority vote of the Baltimore County Senate and House Delegations to the General Assembly.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/19/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2015
Legislative Date
1/21/2015
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/03/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/03/2015
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2015 1/19/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/21/2015 1/21/2015 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/03/2015 2/03/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/03/2015 2/03/2015 Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2015 3/23/2015 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-109 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM