Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Protection of Information by Businesses - Definition of Personal Information
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a specified definition of "personal information" for purposes of provisions of law relating to the protection of information by businesses to include specified identification numbers issued by a unit of State or local government or the United States government.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
8/13/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 8/13/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-3501 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM