Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Forest Conservation Act - Forest Conservation Thresholds and Afforestation and Reforestation Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Pinsky
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 794
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying that units of local government with planning and zoning authority may adopt specified forest conservation thresholds and afforestation and reforestation requirements as part of its local forest conservation program that are more stringent than specified forest conservation thresholds and afforestation and reforestation requirements.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0617
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
7/27/2016
Legislative Date
7/27/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2017
Legislative Date
1/04/2017
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {274038/1
Proceedings
13
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Norman) Adopted
Proceedings
13
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {274038/1 Adopted
Proceedings
14
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
14
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-5)
Proceedings
16
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
18
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Delegate Barve) Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 04/10 (Delegate Moon) Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Moon) Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-3)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 794
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 7/27/2016 7/27/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Natural Resources - Forest Conservation Act - Forest Conservation Thresholds and Reforestation Requirements
Senate 1/04/2017 1/04/2017 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {274038/1 13
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Motion Laid Over (Senator Norman) Adopted 13
Senate 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {274038/1 Adopted 14
Senate 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 14
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Forest Conservation Act - Forest Conservation Thresholds and Afforestation and Reforestation Requirements
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (40-5) 16
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 18
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Delegate Barve) Adopted 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Motion Special Order until 04/10 (Delegate Moon) Adopted 66
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Moon) Adopted 67
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-3) 68
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 794
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources - Forest Conservation Act - Forest Conservation Thresholds and Afforestation and Reforestation Requirements
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM