Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Licensure of Insurance Producers and Public Adjusters - Continuing Education Requirements
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 102
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring insurance producers and public adjusters to complete the continuing education required under certain provisions of law not later than 15 days before the expiration of the license; requiring that certain regulations require providers of continuing education to submit evidence of course completion to the Commissioner within 10 days after completing a course of continuing education; requiring the Commissioner to report on the effectiveness of certain course offerings to certain legislative committees by December 31, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019, January 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/15/2018
Legislative Date
10/15/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2019
Legislative Date
1/03/2019
Action
Hearing 1/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {247271/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
29
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {683197/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 102
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/15/2018 10/15/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Insurance - Licensure of Insurance Producers and Public Adjusters - Continuing Education Requirements
Senate 1/03/2019 1/03/2019 Hearing 1/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {247271/1 Adopted 25
Senate 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25
Text - Third - Insurance - Licensure of Insurance Producers and Public Adjusters - Continuing Education Requirements
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 27
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Referred Economic Matters 29
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {683197/1 Adopted 55
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 56
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 59
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Insurance - Licensure of Insurance Producers and Public Adjusters - Continuing Education Requirements
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 102
Text - Chapter - Insurance - Licensure of Insurance Producers and Public Adjusters - Continuing Education Requirements
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-116, 10-408 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM