Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Anesthesiologists Assistants Act
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Physicians to adopt regulations for the licensure of anesthesiologist assistants and the practice of anesthesia care by anesthesiologist assistants; establishing the Anesthesiologist Assistants Advisory Committee within the Board; providing for the scope of practice for medical acts delegated to an anesthesiologist assistant under specified circumstances; requiring anesthesiologist assistants to execute a specified delegation agreement; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
10/01/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 10/01/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/26/2016 1/26/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/26/2016 1/26/2016 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-5G-01 through 14-5G-27 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM