Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - State Employees and Teachers - Benefits
Sponsored by
Senator Bates
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 9:30 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering certain local employer contributions for members of the Teachers' Pension System; establishing a State Employees' and Teachers' Integrated Pension System and a State Employees' and Teachers' Integrated Pension System Savings Plan for individuals who are members of the Employees' Pension System or the Teachers' Pension System on or after July 1, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0602 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/10/2017
Legislative Date
10/10/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2018
Legislative Date
1/11/2018
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 9:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/10/2017 10/10/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - State Retirement and Pension System - State Employees and Teachers - Benefits
Senate 1/11/2018 1/11/2018 Hearing 1/25 at 9:30 a.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-101, 21-304, 23-212, 23-229, 23-230, 23-401, 23-402, 29-402, 33-101 through 33-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM