Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Board of Community College Trustees
Sponsored by
Senator Beidle
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 246
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the members of the Board of Community College Trustees for Anne Arundel County to reside in Anne Arundel County; establishing a 4-year term for nonstudent members; limiting nonstudent members to three consecutive full terms; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0546
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/08/2019
Legislative Date
8/08/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Board of Community College Trustees
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {494338/1
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {494338/1 Adopted
Proceedings
16
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
16
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Board of Community College Trustees
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
18
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
19
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 246
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Anne Arundel County - Board of Community College Trustees
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/08/2019 8/08/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Board of Community College Trustees
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Favorable with Amendments {494338/1 15
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 15
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Favorable with Amendments {494338/1 Adopted 16
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 16
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Board of Community College Trustees
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 18
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Referred Appropriations 19
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49A
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 51A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 246
Text - Chapter - Anne Arundel County - Board of Community College Trustees
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-401 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:46 PM