Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Early Voting Centers - Reduced Days of Operation
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the days each early voting center is required to be open for voting to be the second Thursday and second Friday before a primary or general election and the second Monday through the Thursday before a primary or general election.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2018
Legislative Date
11/01/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Early Voting Centers - Reduced Days of Operation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2018 11/01/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Election Law - Early Voting Centers - Reduced Days of Operation
Senate 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-301.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM