Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Financial Institutions - Mortgage Lenders - Examinations and Records
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the time period during which the Commissioner of Financial Regulation must examine the business of specified mortgage lender licensees from at least once during any 36-month period to at least once during any 60-month period; and altering the minimum time period for which licensed mortgage lenders must retain specified records from 25 to 61 months.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0142
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/03/2016
Legislative Date
10/03/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Financial Institutions - Mortgage Lenders - Examinations and Records
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2017
Legislative Date
1/09/2017
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
8
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
8
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Financial Institutions - Mortgage Lenders - Examinations and Records
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
9
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
11
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/03/2016 10/03/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Financial Institutions - Mortgage Lenders - Examinations and Records
Senate 1/09/2017 1/09/2017 Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 Hearing 1/17 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 Favorable Adopted 8
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 Second Reading Passed 8
Text - Third - Financial Institutions - Mortgage Lenders - Examinations and Records
Senate 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 9
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Referred Economic Matters 11
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-513, 11-515 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM